Legislator Details
Image Description:
Portrait of James Scully scanned from Men of Progress p.92.
Portrait of James Scully scanned from Men of Progress p.92.
James Scully
AKA:
Number of sessions served 2
Gender: Male
Age at election: 34
Vital Records Information:
Birth
Date: 6/13/1862
City: Osceola Township, MI
County: Livingston County, MI
Country: US
Death
Date: 9/13/1913
City: Ionia, MI
County: Ionia County, MI
Country: US
Type of Burial:
Burial
Date: 9/16/1913
City: Ionia, MI
County: Ionia County, MI
Country: US
Cemetery: Mount Olivet
Marital Information:
Number of Children: 0
Background
Religion: Catholic
Military Service:
Occupation: farmer, teacher, lawyer
Race: Caucasian or White
Education:
District schools, Fenton Normal School, High school in Howell, MI.
Biographical Sketch:
Son of Anthony and Margaret (Gleason) Scully, both born in Ireland. As a boy he worked on the family farm and went to school in the winter months. He became a teacher to fund his law studies. He was admitted to the bar on May 17, 1890. Partnered with J. B. Chaddock in Chaddock & Scully. He held several government positions. Member of the Ancient Order of Hibernians and the Modern Woodmen. Attended St Peter and Paul's Catholic Church in Ionia, MI.
Notable Facts:
Sessions Served:
Chamber: House
Party: Democratic
Committees Served On: Education , Judiciary , Normal Schools , State Library
Postions Held:
City of Residence: Ionia
County of Residence Ionia
District: Ionia 1
District Description:
Date Elected: 11/8/1898
Date Sworn In: 1/4/1899
Date Left Office:
Reason for Leaving Office: N/A
End of Term Status: Departed
Maritial Status: Single
Notes:
Chamber: House
Party: Fusion
Committees Served On: Judiciary , Revision and Amendment of our Present Statutes, University
Postions Held:
City of Residence: Ionia
County of Residence Ionia
District: Ionia 1
District Description: City of Ionia; townships of Danby, Ionia, Lyons, North Plains, Orange, Portland and Ronald
Date Elected: 11/3/1896
Date Sworn In: 1/6/1897
Date Left Office:
Reason for Leaving Office: N/A
End of Term Status: Re-elected
Maritial Status: Single
Notes: A Fusionist, backed by the Democratic and Greenback parties.